Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luis Guízar y Barragán

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Saltillo, Coahuila


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Jun 1895BornCotija
28 Oct 191823.4Ordained PriestPriest
27 Nov 193136.4AppointedBishop of Campeche, México
7 Feb 193236.6Ordained BishopBishop of Campeche, México
28 Feb 193236.7InstalledBishop of Campeche, México
7 Oct 193843.3AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Saltillo, Coahuila, México
7 Oct 193843.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Tinum
5 Apr 195458.8SucceededBishop of Saltillo, Coahuila, México
4 Oct 197580.3RetiredBishop of Saltillo, Coahuila, México
26 Oct 198186.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Saltillo, Coahuila, México

MicroData Summary for Luis Guízar y Barragán:
Bishop Luis Guízar y Barragán (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Saltillo

  • a priest for 63.0 years
  • a bishop for 49.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1932, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013