Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Stanisław Gębicki

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze), Poland

Titular Bishop of Thiges


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Jul 1945 Born
19 Jun 196923.9Ordained PriestPriest of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze), Poland
11 Dec 199954.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze), Poland
11 Dec 199954.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Thiges
6 Jan 200054.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thiges
8 Jul 202075.0RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze), Poland

MicroData Summary for Stanisław Gębicki
Bishop Stanisław Gębicki (born ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWitkowo
Ordained BishopAssomption, Cathedral Basilica, Włocławek, Diocese of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze)

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 157, Number 13,671
  • r: Bollettino, 8 Jul 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 8 Jul 2020

Quantcast