Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Robert Marie Gay, M. Afr. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Kabale, Uganda


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Jan 1927Born
30 Jan 195427.0Ordained PriestPriest of Missionaries of Africa (White Fathers)
11 Jan 199668.9AppointedBishop of Kabale, Uganda
9 Mar 199669.1Ordained BishopBishop of Kabale, Uganda
15 Mar 200376.1RetiredBishop of Kabale, Uganda
29 Jun 201689.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Kabale, Uganda

MicroData Summary for Robert Marie Gay (VIAF: 284807046)
Bishop Robert Marie Gay M. Afr. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Kabale

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOttawa, Canada

  • a priest for 62.4 years
  • a bishop for 20.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 144, Number 12,694
  • d: CB, 30 Jun 2016
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 230, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 16 Jan 2017