Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Paul Kamuza Bakyenga

Archbishop of Mbarara


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Jun 1944 BornBumbaire-Igara
11 Jul 197127.0Ordained PriestPriest of Mbarara, Uganda
6 Mar 198944.6AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Mbarara, Uganda
24 Jun 198944.9Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Mbarara, Uganda
23 Nov 199147.3SucceededBishop of Mbarara, Uganda
2 Jan 199954.5AppointedArchbishop of Mbarara, Uganda

MicroData Summary for Paul Kamuza Bakyenga
Archbishop Paul Kamuza Bakyenga (born ) Archbishop of Mbarara

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Mbarara.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 125, Number 11,273
  • mn: CB, 6 Dec 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.2, 25 Jan 2016; Data: 4 Feb 2016