Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Manuel Gerardo Donoso Donoso, SS.CC.

Archbishop Emeritus of La Serena


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Oct 1936 BornSantiago de Chile
23 Sep 196124.9Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Sacred Hearts of Jesus and Mary
28 Jun 199659.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of La Serena, Chile
28 Jun 199659.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Elo
10 Aug 199659.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Elo
16 Apr 199760.5AppointedArchbishop of La Serena, Chile
14 Dec 201377.2RetiredArchbishop of La Serena, Chile

MicroData Summary for Manuel Gerardo Donoso Donoso:
Archbishop Manuel Gerardo Donoso Donoso SS.CC. (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of La Serena

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of La Serena.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: JPG
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 146, Number 12,779
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 153, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • r: Bollettino, 14 Dec 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 25 Jul 2014