Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Abraham Desta

Vicar Apostolic of Meki, Ethiopia

Titular Bishop of Horrea Aninici


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Mar 1951 Born
20 Apr 198029.0Ordained PriestPriest of Adigrat (Ethiopian), Ethiopia
29 Jan 200351.8AppointedVicar Apostolic of Meki, Ethiopia
29 Jan 200351.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Horrea Aninici
10 May 200352.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Horrea Aninici

MicroData Summary for Abraham Desta
Bishop Abraham Desta (born ) Vicar Apostolic of Meki

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMedea-Sebea

Please contact the Bishop through the Vicariate Apostolic of Meki.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 172, Number 14,398

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 7 Jul 2017