Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jerónimo José de Mata, C.M. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Macau, China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Dec 1804Born
17 Dec 182924.9Ordained DeaconDeacon of Congregation of the Mission
19 Dec 182925.0Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Mission
18 Dec 184339.0SelectedCoadjutor Bishop of Macau, China
17 Jun 184439.4ConfirmedCoadjutor Bishop of Macau, China
17 Jun 184439.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Colophon
28 Mar 184540.2SucceededBishop of Macau, China
21 Dec 184642.0Ordained BishopBishop of Macau, China
25 Sep 186257.7ResignedBishop of Macau, China
5 May 186560.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Macau, China

MicroData Summary for Jerónimo José de Mata (VIAF: 98845536)
Bishop Jerónimo José de Mata C.M. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Macau

EventPlace
Birth PlaceArnoia, Spain
Ordained BishopMacau, Diocese of Macau
Death PlaceCampo Maior

  • a priest for 35.3 years
  • a bishop for 18.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 156, and Page 248
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,700, Page 151, Number 827
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,846, Number 39
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 19 Jan 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast