Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Edmund John Patrick Collins, M.S.C. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Darwin


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Mar 1931BornBraidwood
20 Jul 196332.3Ordained PriestPriest of Missionaries of the Sacred Heart of Jesus
28 Apr 198655.0AppointedBishop of Darwin, Australia
3 Jul 198655.2Ordained BishopBishop of Darwin, Australia
3 Jul 200776.2RetiredBishop of Darwin, Australia
8 Aug 201483.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Darwin, Australia

MicroData Summary for Edmund John Patrick Collins:
Bishop Edmund John Patrick Collins M.S.C. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Darwin

  • a priest for 51.0 years
  • a bishop for 28.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 3 Jul 2007
  • ob/c34: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 144
  • d: CB, 9 Aug 2014
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 221, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015