Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Eugene James Cuskelly, M.S.C. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Brisbane

Titular Bishop of Altinum


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jan 1924BornOakey
18 Dec 194824.9Ordained PriestPriest of Missionaries of the Sacred Heart of Jesus
17 May 198258.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Brisbane, Australia
17 May 198258.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Altinum
21 Jul 198258.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Altinum
29 Apr 199672.3ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Brisbane, Australia
21 Mar 199975.2DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Brisbane, Australia

MicroData Summary for Eugene James Cuskelly:
Bishop Eugene James Cuskelly M.S.C. (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Brisbane

  • a priest for 50.3 years
  • a bishop for 16.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 158, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 11 Aug 2014