Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Peter Chen Jianzhang

Deceased

Bishop of Baoding [Paoting, Ching-YŁan], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Mar 1920Born
14 Aug 194727.4Ordained PriestPriest
20 Apr 198262.1Ordained BishopAuxiliary Bishop of Yixian [Yihsien], China
1988²67.8AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Baoding [Paoting, Ching-YŁan], China
16 Apr 199272.1SucceededBishop of Baoding [Paoting, Ching-YŁan], China
21 Dec 199474.7DiedBishop of Baoding [Paoting, Ching-YŁan], China

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Peter Chen Jianzhang
Bishop Peter Chen Jianzhang (born , died ) Bishop of Baoding [Paoting, Ching-YŁan]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceXushui

  • a priest for 47.3 years
  • a bishop for 12.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 22 Dec 2019
  • b/c2: Clandestine Epsicopal Ordinations in China, Year 2,018, Number 13

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.6, 19 Dec 2019; Data: 24 Dec 2019

Quantcast