Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Domenico Caliandro

Archbishop of Brindisi-Ostuni


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Sep 1947 BornCeglie Messapico
31 Oct 197023.2Ordained DeaconDeacon of Oria, Italy
18 Mar 197123.5Ordained PriestPriest of Oria, Italy
23 Apr 199345.6AppointedBishop of Ugento-Santa Maria di Leuca, Italy
28 Jun 199345.8Ordained BishopBishop of Ugento-Santa Maria di Leuca, Italy
13 May 200052.7AppointedBishop of Narḍ-Gallipoli, Italy
3 Jul 200052.8InstalledBishop of Narḍ-Gallipoli, Italy
20 Oct 201265.1AppointedArchbishop of Brindisi-Ostuni, Italy

MicroData Summary for Domenico Caliandro:
Archbishop Domenico Caliandro (born ) Archbishop of Brindisi-Ostuni

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Brindisi-Ostuni.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 136, Number 12,159
  • ab: Bollettino, 20 Oct 2012

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 23 Sep 2014