Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alberico Semeraro

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Oria, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Jan 1903Born
11 Apr 192522.2Ordained PriestPriest of Taranto, Italy
1 May 194744.2AppointedBishop of Oria, Italy
30 Jun 194744.4Ordained BishopBishop of Oria, Italy
17 Mar 197875.1RetiredBishop of Oria, Italy
24 May 200097.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Oria, Italy

MicroData Summary for Alberico Semeraro
Bishop Alberico Semeraro (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Oria

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMartina Franca

  • a priest for 75.1 years
  • a bishop for 52.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1947, Number 60
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 162, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018