Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Fabio Ciollaro

Bishop of Cerignola-Ascoli Satriano, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Sep 1961 Born
14 Jun 198624.7Ordained PriestPriest of Brindisi, Italy
2 Apr 202260.5AppointedBishop of Cerignola-Ascoli Satriano, Italy
14 Jun 202260.7Ordained BishopBishop of Cerignola-Ascoli Satriano, Italy
29 Jun 202260.7InstalledBishop of Cerignola-Ascoli Satriano, Italy

MicroData Summary for Fabio Ciollaro
Bishop Fabio Ciollaro (born ) Bishop of Cerignola-Ascoli Satriano

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSan Vito dei Normanni, Archdiocese of Brindisi
Ordained PriestSanta Maria della Vitoria, Basilica, San Vito dei Normanni, Archdiocese of Brindisi
Ordained BishopSanta Maria della Vitoria, Basilica, San Vito dei Normanni, Archdiocese of Brindisi-Ostuni

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Cerignola-Ascoli Satriano.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 2 Apr 2022
  • ob/i: CB, 20 Apr 2022
  • c1: AM, 20 Apr 2022
  • c2+: CB, 31 May 2022
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 252, Number 20,936

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2022
Code: web_b, v3.3.3, 16 Jun 2022; Data: 9 Oct 2022