Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Charles Peters Barthélus

Bishop of Port-de-Paix, Haïti


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Nov 1970 Born
25 Jan 199827.1Ordained DeaconDeacon of Port-au-Prince, Haïti
7 Jun 199827.5Ordained PriestPriest of Port-au-Prince, Haïti
14 Apr 202049.4AppointedBishop of Port-de-Paix, Haïti
5 Sep 202049.8Ordained BishopBishop of Port-de-Paix, Haïti

MicroData Summary for Charles Peters Barthélus
Bishop Charles Peters Barthélus (born ) Bishop of Port-de-Paix

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMarchand-Dessalines, Diocese of Les Gonaïves
Ordained BishopNotre-Dame de l'Immaculée Conception, Cathedral, Port-de-Paix, Diocese of Port-de-Paix

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Port-de-Paix.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 14 Apr 2020
  • ob: CB, 13 May 2020
  • c2+: CB, 5 Sep 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 6 Sep 2020

Quantcast