Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pierre-Antoine Paulo, O.M.I.

Bishop Emeritus of Port-de-Paix, Haïti


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Mar 1944 Born
2 Aug 196319.3ProfessedMember of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
20 Dec 196925.7Ordained PriestPriest of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
7 Jul 200157.2AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Port-de-Paix, Haïti
14 Oct 200157.5Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Port-de-Paix, Haïti
1 Mar 200863.9SucceededBishop of Port-de-Paix, Haïti
14 Apr 202076.0RetiredBishop of Port-de-Paix, Haïti

MicroData Summary for Pierre-Antoine Paulo
Bishop Pierre-Antoine Paulo O.M.I. (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Port-de-Paix

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCamp Perrin
Ordained BishopImmaculée Conception, Cathedral, Port-de-Paix, Diocese of Port-de-Paix

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Port-de-Paix.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • s: Bollettino, 1 Mar 2008
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 165, Number 14,071
  • r: Bollettino, 14 Apr 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 14 Apr 2020

Quantcast