Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Leo Yao Liang

Deceased

Coadjutor Bishop of Xiwanzi-Chongli [Siwantze], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Apr 1923Born
1 Aug 194825.3Ordained PriestPriest
19 Feb 200278.8Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Xiwanzi-Chongli [Siwantze], China
30 Dec 200986.7DiedCoadjutor Bishop of Xiwanzi-Chongli [Siwantze], China

MicroData Summary for Leo Yao Liang
Bishop Leo Yao Liang (born , died ) Coadjutor Bishop of Xiwanzi-Chongli [Siwantze]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGonghui Village, Zhangbei county
Death PlaceXiwanzi, Diocese of Xiwanzi-Chongli [Siwantze]

  • a priest for 61.4 years
  • a bishop for 7.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Clandestine Epsicopal Ordinations in China, Year 2,018, Number 90
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 26 Dec 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast