Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Leon Wetmański

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Płock, Poland

Titular Bishop of Camachus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Apr 1886Born
1912²25.7Ordained PriestPriest of Płock, Poland
19 Dec 192741.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Płock, Poland
19 Dec 192741.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Camachus
22 Apr 192842.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Camachus
10 Oct 194155.4DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Płock, Poland

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Leon Wetmański
Bishop Leon Wetmański (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Płock

EventPlace
Birth PlaceZuromin

  • a priest for 29.7 years
  • a bishop for 13.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1941
  • ob/c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1932
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1928, Number 20

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018