Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Wang Cizhang (Wan Tsu-chang)

Deceased

Bishop of Hengyang [Hengchow], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Feb 1908Born
18 May 193426.2Ordained PriestPriest
14 Feb 195244.0AppointedBishop of Hengyang [Hengchow], China
4 May 195244.2Ordained BishopBishop of Hengyang [Hengchow], China
25 Mar 196153.1DiedBishop of Hengyang [Hengchow], China

MicroData Summary for Joseph Wang Cizhang (Wan Tsu-chang)
Bishop Joseph Wang Cizhang (Wan Tsu-chang) (born , died ) Bishop of Hengyang [Hengchow]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHenyang
Ordained BishopPuchi, Diocese of Puqi [Puchi]
Death PlacePrison

  • a priest for 26.8 years
  • a bishop for 8.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132
  • b/c2: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1,952, Number 43
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 25 Jan 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.6, 19 Dec 2019; Data: 26 Jan 2020

Quantcast