Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Horacio del Carmen Valenzuela Abarca

Bishop of Talca, Chile


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Apr 1954 Born
17 Aug 198531.3Ordained PriestPriest of Santiago de Chile
11 Mar 199540.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Santiago de Chile
11 Mar 199540.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Gummi in Proconsulari
7 May 199541.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Gummi in Proconsulari
12 Dec 199642.6AppointedBishop of Talca, Chile

MicroData Summary for Horacio del Carmen Valenzuela Abarca
Bishop Horacio del Carmen Valenzuela Abarca (born ) Bishop of Talca

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSantiago de Chile, Archdiocese of Santiago de Chile
Ordained PriestTemplo Votivo de Maipú, Santiago, Archdiocese of Santiago de Chile

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Talca.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 142, Number 12,549
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 153, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • c1: CB, 10 Apr 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 15 Apr 2017