Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Andrés Arteaga Manieu

Auxiliary Bishop of Santiago de Chile

Titular Bishop of Baliana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Jan 1959 BornSantiago de Chile
31 May 198627.3Ordained PriestPriest of Santiago de Chile
10 Jul 200142.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Santiago de Chile
10 Jul 200142.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Baliana
19 Aug 200142.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Baliana

MicroData Summary for Andrés Arteaga Manieu:
Bishop Andrés Arteaga Manieu (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Santiago de Chile

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Santiago de Chile.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 164, Number 14,026

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015