Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop António de Sousa Tavora, O.E.S.A. †

Deceased

Bishop of Porto


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Sep 1690BornCasillas
17 Mar 171524.5Ordained DeaconDeacon of Order of Hermits of St. Augustine
19 Mar 171524.5Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Hermits of St. Augustine
13 Jan 175766.3SelectedBishop of Porto, Portugal
28 Mar 175766.5ConfirmedBishop of Porto, Portugal
3 Jul 175766.8Ordained BishopBishop of Porto, Portugal
4 Jun 176675.7DiedBishop of Porto, Portugal

MicroData Summary for António de Sousa Tavora:
Bishop António de Sousa Tavora O.E.S.A. (born , died ) Bishop of Porto

  • a priest for 51.2 years
  • a bishop for 8.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 346
  • bp/bd/c2+: CB, 24 Jul 2014
  • ob/bp/bd: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 219, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1757, Number 17

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.1, 31 Dec 2015; Data: 7 Jan 2016