Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Samuel Oton Sidin, O.F.M. Cap.

Bishop of Sintang, Indonesia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Dec 1954 Born
18 Jul 198227.5Professed (Perpetual Vows)Member of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
1 Jul 198429.5Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
21 Dec 201662.0AppointedBishop of Sintang, Indonesia
22 Mar 201762.2Ordained BishopBishop of Sintang, Indonesia

MicroData Summary for Samuel Oton Sidin
Bishop Samuel Oton Sidin O.F.M. Cap. (born ) Bishop of Sintang

EventPlace
Birth PlacePontianak
Ordained BishopBaning Stadium, Sintang, Diocese of Sintang

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Sintang.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 21 Dec 2016
  • ob/c2: CB, 23 Dec 2016
  • c34: CB, 22 Mar 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 23 Mar 2017