Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giulio Mencuccini, C.P.

Bishop of Sanggau, Indonesia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Mar 1946 Born
5 Sep 196418.4ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Passion
6 Aug 197327.3Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Passion
22 Jan 199043.8AppointedBishop of Sanggau, Indonesia
3 Jun 199044.2Ordained BishopBishop of Sanggau, Indonesia

MicroData Summary for Giulio Mencuccini
Bishop Giulio Mencuccini C.P. (born ) Bishop of Sanggau

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFossacesia

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Sanggau.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 125, Number 11,282

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast