Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Cosmas Shi Enxiang

Deceased

Bishop of Yixian [Yihsien], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Apr 1922Born
14 Aug 194725.3Ordained PriestPriest
24 Jun 198260.1Ordained BishopAuxiliary Bishop of Yixian [Yihsien], China
1994²71.7AppointedBishop of Yixian [Yihsien], China
Jan 2015³92.7DiedBishop of Yixian [Yihsien], China

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Cosmas Shi Enxiang
Bishop Cosmas Shi Enxiang (born , died Jan 2015) Bishop of Yixian [Yihsien]

EventPlace
Death PlacePrison

  • a priest for 67.3 years
  • a bishop for 32.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 23 Dec 2019
  • b/c2: Clandestine Episcopal Ordinations in China, Year 2018, Number 18

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast