Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Leo Schwarz

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Trier, Germany

Titular Bishop of Abbir Germaniciana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Oct 1931Born
31 Jul 196028.8Ordained PriestPriest of Trier, Germany
4 Jan 198250.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Trier, Germany
4 Jan 198250.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Abbir Germaniciana
28 Mar 198250.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Abbir Germaniciana
14 Mar 200674.4RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Trier, Germany
26 Nov 201887.1DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Trier, Germany

MicroData Summary for Leo Schwarz (VIAF: 54982113)
Bishop Leo Schwarz (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Trier

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBraunweiler
Death PlaceTrier, Diocese of Trier

  • a priest for 58.3 years
  • a bishop for 36.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 14 Mar 2006
  • d: CB, 26 Nov 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 27 Nov 2018

Quantcast