Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Robert Brahm

Auxiliary Bishop of Trier

Titular Bishop of Mimiana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Aug 1956 BornOberwesel
14 Jul 198427.9Ordained PriestPriest of Trier, Germany
9 Dec 200347.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Trier, Germany
9 Dec 200347.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Mimiana
8 Feb 200447.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Mimiana

MicroData Summary for Robert Brahm:
Bishop Robert Brahm (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Trier

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Trier.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 174, Number 14,526

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013