Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johann Werner Schnatz

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Bamberg, Germany

Titular Bishop of Dragobitia (Drago)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Dec 1660Born
1685²24.0Ordained PriestPriest of Bamberg, Germany
16 Nov 170544.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Bamberg, Germany
16 Nov 170544.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Dragobitia (Drago)
21 Dec 170544.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Dragobitia (Drago)
23 Jul 172362.5DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Bamberg, Germany

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Johann Werner Schnatz (VIAF: 59882146)
Bishop Johann Werner Schnatz (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Bamberg

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBamberg
Ordained BishopSankt Gangold, Mainz, Archdiocese of Mainz

  • a priest for 38.5 years
  • a bishop for 17.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 188
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 206, Number 17,016
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1705, Number 14
  • b/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 229, Number 19,040

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018