Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alexandros Scandar

Deceased

Bishop of Assiut {Lycopolis} (Coptic)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Mar 1895BornCairo
11 Jun 192227.2Ordained PriestPriest
9 Aug 194752.4AppointedBishop of Assiut {Lycopolis} (Coptic), Egypt
14 Dec 194752.8Ordained BishopBishop of Assiut {Lycopolis} (Coptic), Egypt
29 Dec 196469.8DiedBishop of Assiut {Lycopolis} (Coptic), Egypt

MicroData Summary for Alexandros Scandar:
Bishop Alexandros Scandar (born , died ) Bishop of Assiut {Lycopolis}

  • a priest for 42.5 years
  • a bishop for 17.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c23: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 111, Number 9,798
  • c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132, Number 11,906
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1947, Number 129

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013