Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Marie-Antoine Roy, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Edmundston, New Brunswick


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Mar 1893BornSaint-Michel-de-Bellechasse
6 Aug 191623.4Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
9 Jun 194552.2AppointedBishop of Edmundston, New Brunswick, Canada
15 Aug 194552.4Ordained BishopBishop of Edmundston, New Brunswick, Canada
27 Oct 194855.6DiedBishop of Edmundston, New Brunswick, Canada

MicroData Summary for Marie-Antoine Roy:
Bishop Marie-Antoine Roy O.F.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Edmundston

  • a priest for 32.2 years
  • a bishop for 3.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 155, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1945, Number 44

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013