Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Benito Epifanio Rodríguez

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Rosario

Titular Bishop of Arycanda


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 May 1903BornGodeken
18 Dec 192623.5Ordained PriestPriest of Rosario, Argentina
23 Sep 196057.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Rosario, Argentina
23 Sep 196057.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Arycanda
6 Nov 196057.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Arycanda
1976²72.6ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Rosario, Argentina
15 Feb 200197.7DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Rosario, Argentina

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Benito Epifanio Rodríguez:
Bishop Benito Epifanio Rodríguez (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Rosario

  • a priest for 74.1 years
  • a bishop for 40.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1960, Number 117
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 166, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015