Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Olimpo Santiago Maresma

Deceased

Archbishop of Mendoza, Argentina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Jul 1916Born
21 Dec 194024.4Ordained PriestPriest
7 Sep 196549.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Mendoza, Argentina
7 Sep 196549.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Gegi
30 Jan 196649.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Gegi
31 Oct 197458.2AppointedArchbishop of Mendoza, Argentina
3 Jul 197962.9DiedArchbishop of Mendoza, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Olimpo Santiago Maresma
Archbishop Olimpo Santiago Maresma (born , died ) Archbishop of Mendoza

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCasilda

  • a priest for 38.5 years
  • a bishop for 13.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018