Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Zygmunt Robaszkiewicz, M.S.F.

Bishop of Morombe, Madagascar


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Oct 1958 Born
11 Jun 198627.6Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of Missionaries of the Holy Family
24 Apr 200142.5AppointedBishop of Morombe, Madagascar
2 Sep 200142.8Ordained BishopBishop of Morombe, Madagascar

MicroData Summary for Zygmunt Robaszkiewicz
Bishop Zygmunt Robaszkiewicz M.S.F. (born ) Bishop of Morombe

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNietuszkowo, Poland

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Morombe.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 164, Number 14,035
  • obp: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 165, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast