Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Marco Tulio Ramírez Roa

Deceased

Bishop of San Cristóbal de Venezuela


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Jun 1923BornCordero (Techira)
25 May 194723.9Ordained PriestPriest
31 Mar 197046.8AppointedBishop of Cabimas, Venezuela
11 Jul 197047.1Ordained BishopBishop of Cabimas, Venezuela
26 Oct 198461.3AppointedBishop of San Cristóbal de Venezuela
26 Feb 199874.7DiedBishop of San Cristóbal de Venezuela

MicroData Summary for Marco Tulio Ramírez Roa:
Bishop Marco Tulio Ramírez Roa (born , died ) Bishop of San Cristóbal de Venezuela

  • a priest for 50.8 years
  • a bishop for 27.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 154, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013