Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Rafael Angel González Ramírez

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Barinas


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Aug 1916BornPalmira
15 Oct 194125.2Ordained PriestPriest
23 Jul 196548.9AppointedBishop of Barinas, Venezuela
22 Aug 196549.0Ordained BishopBishop of Barinas, Venezuela
1 Aug 199276.0RetiredBishop of Barinas, Venezuela
10 May 200790.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Barinas, Venezuela

MicroData Summary for Rafael Angel González Ramírez:
Bishop Rafael Angel González Ramírez (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Barinas

  • a priest for 65.6 years
  • a bishop for 41.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 123
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 191, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013