Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alejandro Figueroa Medina

Deceased

Bishop of Guanare


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Mar 1925BornColón
5 Mar 195024.9Ordained PriestPriest
12 Mar 198660.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Barinas, Venezuela
12 Mar 198660.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Forconium
24 May 198661.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Forconium
21 Feb 199569.9AppointedBishop of Guanare, Venezuela
29 Sep 200075.5DiedBishop of Guanare, Venezuela

MicroData Summary for Alejandro Figueroa Medina:
Bishop Alejandro Figueroa Medina (born , died ) Bishop of Guanare

  • a priest for 50.5 years
  • a bishop for 14.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 105, Number 9,145
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 162, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 162, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015