Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Martin-Jean Pontvianne, M.E.P. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Northern Cochin {Cocincina Settentrionale}

Titular Bishop of Botrys


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Mar 1839BornYssingeaux, France
30 May 186324.2Ordained PriestPriest of La Société des Missions Etrangères
7 Sep 187738.5AppointedVicar Apostolic of Northern Cochin {Cocincina Settentrionale}, Viet Nam
7 Sep 187738.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Botrys
12 May 187839.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Botrys
30 Jul 187940.4DiedVicar Apostolic of Northern Cochin {Cocincina Settentrionale}, Viet Nam

MicroData Summary for Martin-Jean Pontvianne:
Bishop Martin-Jean Pontvianne M.E.P. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Northern Cochin {Cocincina Settentrionale}

  • a priest for 16.2 years
  • a bishop for 1.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 154

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013