Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Guerino Dominique Picchi, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Alep [Beroea, Halab]

Titular Bishop of Sebaste in Palaestina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Aug 1915BornFerentino, Italy
6 Jul 194125.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
20 Jun 198064.8AppointedVicar Apostolic of Alep [Beroea, Halab], Syria
20 Jun 198064.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Sebaste in Palaestina
21 Sep 198065.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sebaste in Palaestina
9 Jul 199276.9RetiredVicar Apostolic of Alep [Beroea, Halab], Syria
19 Jul 199781.9DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Alep [Beroea, Halab], Syria

MicroData Summary for Guerino Dominique Picchi:
Bishop Guerino Dominique Picchi O.F.M. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Alep [Beroea, Halab]

  • a priest for 56.0 years
  • a bishop for 16.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 151, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013