Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Manuel José Pardio Lizama

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Yucatán (Mérida), México

Titular Bishop of Germanicopolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Jun 1790Born
27 Apr 184049.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Yucatán (Mérida), México
27 Apr 184049.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Germanicopolis
25 Sep 184252.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Germanicopolis
20 Apr 186170.8DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Yucatán (Mérida), México

MicroData Summary for Manuel José Pardio Lizama
Bishop Manuel José Pardio Lizama (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Yucatán (Mérida)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMérida

  • a bishop for 18.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 203
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 197, Number 16,027
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1842, Number 56

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018