Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Ignazio Paoli, C.P. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Bucarest {Bucureşti}, Romania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Jul 1818Born
19 Aug 187052.0AppointedBishop of Nicopoli, Bulgaria
28 Aug 187052.0Ordained BishopBishop of Nicopoli, Bulgaria
24 Apr 1883³64.7ResignedBishop of Nicopoli, Bulgaria
30 Apr 188364.7AppointedArchbishop of Bucarest {Bucureşti}, Romania
27 Feb 188566.5DiedArchbishop of Bucarest {Bucureşti}, Romania

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ignazio Paoli
Archbishop Ignazio Paoli C.P. (born , died ) Archbishop of Bucarest {Bucureşti}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSanta Maria a Vezzano, Archdiocese of Firenze {Florence}, Italy
Ordained BishopSs. Jean et Paul au Coelius, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a bishop for 14.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 160, and Page 413
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1870, Number 37

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 11 Apr 2017