Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Hippolyte-Louis Agosto, C.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Nicopoli, Bulgaria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Jul 1838Born
27 Apr 188344.7AppointedBishop of Nicopoli, Bulgaria
31 May 188344.8Ordained BishopBishop of Nicopoli, Bulgaria
3 Dec 189355.3DiedBishop of Nicopoli, Bulgaria

MicroData Summary for Hippolyte-Louis Agosto (VIAF: 288903249)
Bishop Hippolyte-Louis Agosto C.P. (born , died ) Bishop of Nicopoli

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAndora, Liguria
Ordained BishopSs. Jean et Paul, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a bishop for 10.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1894
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 413
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1883, Number 26

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 11 Apr 2017