Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Fulgenzio Arminio Monforte, O.S.A. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Nusco


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1620¹BornAvellino
1 Apr 166949.2AppointedBishop of Nusco, Italy
7 Apr 166949.2Ordained BishopBishop of Nusco, Italy
1680¹60.0ResignedBishop of Nusco, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Fulgenzio Arminio Monforte:
Bishop Fulgenzio Arminio Monforte O.S.A. , Bishop Emeritus of Nusco

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 294
  • bp/bd/c34: CB, 24 Jul 2014
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1669, Number 5

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 11 Apr 2015