Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Henri Provana, O.C.D. †

Deceased

Bishop of Nice


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Nov 1631BornLeynici
19 Dec 165423.1Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Discalced Carmelites
23 Feb 167139.3AppointedBishop of Nice, France
8 Mar 167139.3Ordained BishopBishop of Nice, France
30 Nov 170675.1DiedBishop of Nice, France

MicroData Summary for Henri Provana:
Bishop Henri Provana O.C.D. (born , died ) Bishop of Nice

  • a priest for 51.9 years
  • a bishop for 35.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 287

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013