Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Armenj (Armenio)

Deceased

Bishop of Teramo, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1622¹Born
17 Nov 164725.8Ordained PriestPriest
28 Jul 167048.5AppointedBishop of Teramo, Italy
10 Aug 167048.6Ordained BishopBishop of Teramo, Italy
25 May 169371.3DiedBishop of Teramo, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Armenj (Armenio)
Bishop Giuseppe Armenj (Armenio) (born 1622, died ) Bishop of Teramo

EventPlace
Birth PlacePennen

  • a priest for 45.5 years
  • a bishop for 22.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 91
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1670, Number 20

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018