Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Irzio Luigi Magliacani, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Arabia

Titular Bishop of Dium


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Feb 1892BornCastel del Piano, Italy
20 Mar 191523.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
23 Oct 194856.6AppointedApostolic Administrator of Arabia, Yemen
25 Dec 194957.8AppointedVicar Apostolic of Arabia, Yemen
25 Dec 194957.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Dium
28 May 195058.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Dium
4 Nov 196977.7RetiredVicar Apostolic of Arabia, Yemen
15 Mar 197684.0DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Arabia, Yemen

MicroData Summary for Irzio Luigi Magliacani:
Bishop Irzio Luigi Magliacani O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Arabia

  • a priest for 60.9 years
  • a bishop for 25.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1950, Number 31

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015