Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ireneo Enrico Chelucci

Deceased

Bishop of Montalcino


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Sep 1882BornSaturnana
17 Jun 190522.7Ordained PriestPriest of Pistoia e Prato, Italy
22 Jul 193855.8AppointedBishop of Montalcino, Italy
18 Sep 193856.0Ordained BishopBishop of Montalcino, Italy
8 Jun 197087.7DiedBishop of Montalcino, Italy

MicroData Summary for Ireneo Enrico Chelucci:
Bishop Ireneo Enrico Chelucci (born , died ) Bishop of Montalcino

  • a priest for 65.0 years
  • a bishop for 31.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1939
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1938, Number 67

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013