Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Debernardi

Deceased

Bishop of Pistoia e Prato, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Jan 1884Born
27 Jun 190723.4Ordained PriestPriest of Torino {Turin}, Italy
13 Mar 193349.1AppointedBishop of Pistoia e Prato, Italy
17 Apr 193349.2Ordained BishopBishop of Pistoia e Prato, Italy
19 Sep 195369.6DiedBishop of Pistoia e Prato, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Debernardi
Bishop Giuseppe Debernardi (born , died ) Bishop of Pistoia e Prato

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCorio Canavese

  • a priest for 46.2 years
  • a bishop for 20.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1,939
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1,933, Number 17

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast