Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Giorgis

Deceased

Bishop of Susa, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Apr 1887Born
3 Oct 190922.4Ordained PriestPriest of Cuneo, Italy
30 Sep 193144.4AppointedBishop of Trivento, Italy
8 Dec 193144.6Ordained BishopBishop of Trivento, Italy
24 Jan 193244.7InstalledBishop of Trivento, Italy
14 Jul 193750.2AppointedBishop of Fiesole, Italy
31 Dec 195366.7AppointedBishop of Susa, Italy
22 May 195467.1DiedBishop of Susa, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Giorgis
Bishop Giovanni Giorgis (born , died ) Bishop of Susa

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCuneo

  • a priest for 44.6 years
  • a bishop for 22.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1,931, Number 70
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 12, Number 653, Ascendance

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast