Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Philippe Lussier, C.SS.R. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Saint Paul in Alberta


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Oct 1911BornWeedon
15 Aug 193220.8ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
18 Sep 193725.9Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
16 Jun 195240.7AppointedBishop of Saint Paul in Alberta, Canada
17 Aug 195240.8Ordained BishopBishop of Saint Paul in Alberta, Canada
17 Aug 196856.8ResignedBishop of Saint Paul in Alberta, Canada
17 Aug 196856.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Mutugenna
15 Dec 197059.1ResignedTitular Bishop of Mutugenna
9 Oct 198675.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Saint Paul in Alberta, Canada

MicroData Summary for Philippe Lussier:
Bishop Philippe Lussier C.SS.R. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Saint Paul in Alberta

  • a priest for 49.0 years
  • a bishop for 34.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1952, Number 72
  • dp: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 211, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • ob/obp: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 211, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015