Catholic-Hierarchy DC

[Patriotic Bishop James Li Shu-ren], O.S.A. †

Chinese Patriotic Catholic Association

Not in Union with the Holy See

Deceased

Bishop of Yueyang [Yochow], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Jan 1919Born
24 Aug 193920.6ProfessedMember of Order of St. Augustine
9 Oct 194223.7Solemn VowsMember of Order of St. Augustine
9 Jun 194627.4Ordained PriestPriest of Order of St. Augustine
23 Oct 195839.7SelectedBishop of Yueyang [Yochow], China
26 Oct 195839.7Ordained BishopBishop of Yueyang [Yochow], China
7 Oct 199778.7DiedBishop of Yueyang [Yochow], China

MicroData Summary for James Li Shu-ren
Bishop James Li Shu-ren O.S.A. (born , died ) Bishop of Yueyang [Yochow]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceYsikiaho
Ordained BishopChangsha, Archdiocese of Changsha [Changsha]
Death PlaceYiyang, Prefecture Apostolic of Yueyang [Yochow]

  • a priest for 51.3 years
  • a bishop for 38.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 19 Dec 2019
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 14*, Number 21
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 150, Number 13,061
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 151, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • bd/op: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 152, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 219, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast