Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Li Congzhe

Deceased

Bishop of Hohhot [Suiyüan], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Dec 1915Born
26 Jul 194226.5Ordained PriestPriest
27 Jul 198468.5Ordained BishopBishop of Hohhot [Suiyüan], China
20 Jun 200286.4DiedBishop of Hohhot [Suiyüan], China

MicroData Summary for Joseph Li Congzhe
Bishop Joseph Li Congzhe (born , died ) Bishop of Hohhot [Suiyüan]

  • a priest for 59.9 years
  • a bishop for 17.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 24 Dec 2019
  • b/c2: Clandestine Epsicopal Ordinations in China, Year 2,018, Number 35

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast